MD HB8 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB179
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-10 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-10 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the departments of Housing and Community Development, Planning, Human Services, and Agriculture jointly to produce a report to the General Assembly for each county and State legislative district on the food environment in the county and district on or before July 1, 2024, and every 2 years thereafter; requiring the reports to include metrics that determine food insecurity zones; authorizing the departments to collaborate with certain universities, nonprofit organizations, and local planning and zoning departments; etc.
Title
Counties and State Legislative Districts - Food Environment Reports
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-10 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2023-01-17 | House | Hearing 1/26 at 2:00 p.m. |
2023-01-17 | House | Hearing canceled |
2023-01-12 | House | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-11 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2022-11-15 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB179 (Carry Over) 2022-03-22 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Agriculture, Department of
Counties
Data
Demographics
Economic Development
Federal Aid
Food
Food Insecurity
Food Stamps
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Human Services, Department of
Nonprofit Organizations
Partnerships
Planning, Department of
Reports
State Universities and Colleges
Time
Zoning and Planning
Counties
Data
Demographics
Economic Development
Federal Aid
Food
Food Insecurity
Food Stamps
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Human Services, Department of
Nonprofit Organizations
Partnerships
Planning, Department of
Reports
State Universities and Colleges
Time
Zoning and Planning
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Housing and Community Development | 6 | 308.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |