MD HB8 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a guardian of the property of a minor or disabled person to petition the court to deposit cash belonging to the minor or disabled person in an amount not exceeding $200,000 into a single restricted account; requiring specified excess amounts to be deposited into additional restricted accounts not exceeding $200,000; and authorizing a deposit under the Act to be made into any type of account, including a certificate of deposit, in a specified financial institution or one that accepts deposits and is federally insured.
Title
Estates and Trusts - Guardianship Accounts - Form and Limits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2013-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-02-22 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2013-02-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2013-02-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-02-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {222518/1 Report Adopted |
2013-02-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2013-01-23 | House | Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-09 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2012-11-01 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Courts
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Disabilities
Estates and Trusts
Guardians
Minors
Orphans' Court
Petitions
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Disabilities
Estates and Trusts
Guardians
Minors
Orphans' Court
Petitions