MD HB798 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1642
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-04 - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-04 - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Committee on Air Quality to create, on or before January 1, 2023, an air quality sampling and monitoring protocol for the collection of air quality and public health data associated with certain large animal-feeding operations.
Title
Community Healthy Air Act
Sponsors
Del. Jay Jalisi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-03 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB1642 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
Agriculture
Air Pollution
Animals
Committees and Commissions
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Health
Health Occupations
internet
Public Health
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Air Pollution
Animals
Committees and Commissions
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Health
Health Occupations
internet
Public Health
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0798?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/hb/hb0798f.pdf |