MD HB798 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a requirement that an annual report be filed with the Maryland Insurance Commissioner by insurers, nonprofit health service plans, health maintenance organizations, dental plan organizations, and specified other persons or entities regarding a summary description of specified clinical issues and diagnostic and therapeutic services; etc.
Title
Health Insurance - Reporting Requirements - Repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121 |
2016-04-01 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2016-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2016-03-09 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-09 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-08 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2016-02-25 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Claims
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Examinations
Fees
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Hearings
Identification
Insurance - Health
Managed Care Organizations
Medical Assistance
Medical Research
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Claims
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Examinations
Fees
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Hearings
Identification
Insurance - Health
Managed Care Organizations
Medical Assistance
Medical Research
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Reports
Rules and Regulations