MD HB798 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-08 - Re-referred Budget and Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-08 - Re-referred Budget and Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the governing body of Anne Arundel County to provide, by law, a payment deferral of the county property tax for specified residential real property; requiring the governing body of Anne Arundel County to specify the duration and amounts, restrictions, and income eligibility requirements for the payment deferral; requiring the payment of the deferred property taxes under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Payment Deferral - Eligibility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-08 | Re-referred Budget and Taxation | |
2011-04-02 | First Reading Senate Rules | |
2011-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2011-03-31 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-31 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | |
2011-02-16 | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-11 | First Reading Ways and Means |