MD HB797 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 631
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 631
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a specified declaration so as to include on site alternatives under specified circumstances; repealing a requirement that the Department of the Environment develop standards and adopt regulations to establish specified compensation ratios for mitigation through mitigation banks; requiring specified standards and regulations adopted by the Department to ensure that the potential for on-site mitigation is considered whenever it may be environmentally preferable; etc.
Title
Nontidal Wetlands - Nontidal Wetland Mitigation Banking
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-1) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-1) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 631 |
2016-04-11 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-1) |
2016-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {830114/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-17 | House | Special Order until later today (Delegate Barve) Adopted |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {830114/1 |
2016-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2016-03-02 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-08 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Counties
Environment
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters
Federal Government
Notices
Public Information
Rules and Regulations
Soil Conservation
Water
Wetlands
Environment
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters
Federal Government
Notices
Public Information
Rules and Regulations
Soil Conservation
Water
Wetlands