MD HB796 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 448
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 448
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the establishment of local maternal mortality review teams in each county; requiring the local health officer to convene the local team under certain circumstances; establishing the purpose and duties of the local teams; authorizing the Maryland Department of Health to release certain information at the discretion of the Secretary of Health; requiring the Secretary to provide copies of certain death certificates to the Maternal Mortality Review Program; etc.
Title
Public Health - Maternal Mortality Review Program - Establishment of Local Teams
Sponsors
Del. Jheanelle Wilkins [D] | Del. Heather Bagnall [D] | Del. Terri Hill [D] | Del. Ken Kerr [D] |
Del. Robbyn Lewis [D] | Del. Mary Ann Lisanti [D] | Del. Edith Patterson [D] | Del. Emily Shetty [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-0) (Y: 130 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-0) (Y: 130 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 448 |
2019-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-03-26 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2019-03-25 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-0) |
2019-03-22 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-22 | House | Favorable with Amendments {566886/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-02-13 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Agents and Brokers
Archives
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Data
Death
Disclosure
Discrimination
Examinations
Fines
Health
Health Occupations
Investigations and Inquiries
Law Enforcement
Medical Examiners
Medical Research
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Open Government
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences
Pregnancy
Privacy
Public Health
Public Information
Records
Reports
Social Security
Substance Abuse
Vital Records
Women
Agents and Brokers
Archives
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Data
Death
Disclosure
Discrimination
Examinations
Fines
Health
Health Occupations
Investigations and Inquiries
Law Enforcement
Medical Examiners
Medical Research
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Open Government
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences
Pregnancy
Privacy
Public Health
Public Information
Records
Reports
Social Security
Substance Abuse
Vital Records
Women