MD HB794 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 504
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 504
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the salary of the Sheriff of Carroll County to $125,000, from $110,000, beginning December 6, 2022, and to $140,000 beginning December 5, 2023, and thereafter; and providing that the Act does not apply to the salary of the incumbent Sheriff.
Title
Carroll County - Sheriff - Salary
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 504 |
2021-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2021-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-29 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB613 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 505
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 2 | 320 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |