MD HB79 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the positions eligible for membership in the Correctional Officers' Retirement System to include specified individuals who elect to transfer from the Employees' Retirement System; altering specified eligibility requirements for a normal service retirement allowance for members of the Correctional Officers' Retirement System; altering eligibility requirements for a deferred vested retirement allowance for members of the Correctional Officers' Retirement System; etc.
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership and Eligibility for Retirement
Sponsors
Del. Ben Barnes [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2015-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Hearing 4/02 at 9:15 a.m. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2015-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2015-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {484766/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2015-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-23 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Correctional Officers
Retirement Systems
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment
Retirement Systems
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment