MD HB787 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-26 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 827
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring each local correctional facility and each correctional facility in the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to have a policy in place regarding the medical care of pregnant inmates that addresses certain matters including access to child placement resources; requiring the managing official of each facility to provide the written policy to an inmate at the time of a positive pregnancy test; requiring the Maryland Commission on Correctional Standards to routinely review each facility's policy; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Correctional Facilities - Pregnant Inmates - Medical Care

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (34-11) (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (107-29) (Y: 108 N: 30 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-26HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 827
2018-04-05HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed (34-11)
2018-04-03SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-03SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-02SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-02SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-01HouseThird Reading Passed (107-29)
2018-02-27HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-02-27HouseFavorable with Amendments {882416/1 Report Adopted
2018-02-26HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2018-02-15HouseHearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-01HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback