MD HB786 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 583
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 583
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, in conjunction with the State Department of Education, to recommend best practices for county boards of education to provide to students specified needs assessments and specified behavioral health counseling services; providing that county boards may not be required to provide specified assessments or counseling services; prohibiting specified insurance policies or contracts from denying a covered medically necessary behavioral health care service for a specified student; etc.
Title
Education - Individualized or Group Behavioral Counseling Services - Establishment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 583 |
2017-04-10 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2017-04-10 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {534636/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2017-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-20 | House | Floor Amendment {983327/1 (Delegate Cullison) Adopted |
2017-03-20 | House | Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted |
2017-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {745265/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2017-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Counselors
Counties
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance - Health
Mental and Behavioral Health
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Counties
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance - Health
Mental and Behavioral Health
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools