MD HB786 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-8)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-8)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering specified notice procedures required to enforce a lien on specified property stored in a leased space at a self-service storage facility; requiring a specified agreement to contain a specified statement; establishing that the balance of proceeds from a specified sale is presumed abandoned under specified circumstances; altering specified procedures required for the administration of specified proceeds from a specified sale.
Title
Self-Service Storage Facilities - Enforcement of Lien - Procedures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103 |
2015-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2015-04-08 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendment |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {507675/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2015-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2015-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-19 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-19 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2015-03-04 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Abandoned Property
Advertising
Commerce and Business
Commercial Law - Generally
Contracts
Electronic Commerce
Leases and Rent
Liens
News Media
Notices
Personal Property
Postal Service
Storage
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Advertising
Commerce and Business
Commercial Law - Generally
Contracts
Electronic Commerce
Leases and Rent
Liens
News Media
Notices
Personal Property
Postal Service
Storage
Telecommunications and Information Technology