MD HB784 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 773
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Public Service Commission to provide certain notice of an application for a certificate of public convenience and necessity on its website and social media platforms; requiring a certain applicant to identify whether a certain overhead transmission line is located on certain sites or on land subject to a certain easement under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electric Facilities – Construction of Overhead Transmission Lines – Additional Notice Requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 773
2018-04-06HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2018-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-04SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2018-04-03SenateHearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2018-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {413899/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2018-02-15HouseHearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-01HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback