MD HB782 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-8)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 390
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that certain money in the Maryland Prepaid College Trust may not be considered money of or be commingled with the Maryland Broker-Dealer College Investment Plan or the Maryland ABLE Program; requiring the Maryland 529 Board to allow the transfer of funds from certain trusts and plans to any qualified ABLE program; altering the limit on money and assets that a certain account holder can contribute to an ABLE account during a certain period of time; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program – Modifications

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 390
2018-03-30HouseReturned Passed
2018-03-29SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2018-03-28SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-28SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-28SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2018-03-27SenateHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-16SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2018-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2018-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments {836283/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-02-21HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-01HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback