MD HB781 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1367
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a gas company or an electric company from imposing a deposit requirement on customers who are at least 65 years old and have an annual income at or below 300% of the federal poverty level, or terminating gas service or electric service to the customer for failure to pay all or part of a deposit under certain circumstances.
Title
Gas and Electric Companies - Deposit Charges and Termination of Service
Sponsors
Del. Jay Jalisi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2022-02-09 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-03 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
HB1367 (Carry Over) 2021-03-01 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities | 7 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 307 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |