MD HB780 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adding the Harford County Farm Fair to the list of off-site events for which a holder of a brewing company off-site permit may use the permit; and altering the time period within which the permit holder is required to notify the Comptroller of an intention to attend an off-site event.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Brewing Company Off-Site Permits - Harford County Farm Fair
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-1) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-1) |
2017-03-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-06 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2017-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Comptroller
Fairs
Harford County
Notices
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Comptroller
Fairs
Harford County
Notices
Time