MD HB778 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the eligibility requirements for family planning services under the Maryland Medical Assistance Program by requiring the Program to provide those services beginning on January 1, 2012, to all women whose family income is at or below 200 percent of the poverty level, as permitted by federal law.
Title
Family Planning Works Act
Sponsors
Del. Tiffany Alston [D] | Del. Charles Barkley [D] | Del. Elizabeth Bobo [D] | Del. Alfred Carr [D] |
Del. William Frick [D] | Del. Heather Mizeur [D] | Del. Justin Ross [D] | Del. Michael Smigiel [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 39 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 121 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 121 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (39-7) | |
2011-04-01 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-01 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2011-03-29 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-25 | First Reading Finance | |
2011-04-03 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-25 | Third Reading Passed (121-15) | |
2011-03-24 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-24 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-25 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2011-02-23 | Hearing 3/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-10 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Appropriations
Birth Control
Grants
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Legislative Services, Department of
Medical Assistance
Women
Birth Control
Grants
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Legislative Services, Department of
Medical Assistance
Women