MD HB776 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a registered home builder or a registered sales representative to include in any initial contract for the initial sale of a new home a copy of the most recent edition of "Buying a New Home: Consumer Rights and Remedies Under Maryland Law"; requiring a contract for the initial sale of a new home to contain a certain acknowledgment that the purchaser received certain consumer protection information; requiring a certain acknowledgment to be independently initialed by the purchaser; etc.
Title
Home Builders and Home Improvement Contractors - Contract Requirements - Consumer Protection Information
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn |
2020-02-28 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-04 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-31 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Attorney General
Business Regulation and Occupations
Consumer Protection
Contractors
Contracts
Disclosure
Home Improvement
Publications
Real Property
Signatures
Attorney General
Business Regulation and Occupations
Consumer Protection
Contractors
Contracts
Disclosure
Home Improvement
Publications
Real Property
Signatures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Business Regulation | 5 | 603 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Business Regulation | 8 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 14 | 117 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |