MD HB776 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Board of Public Works to collect certain information related to health care for all construction-related, competitive sealed bids for projects for a certain time period; requiring the Board to direct certain agencies to include certain information in a certain request; requiring the Board, by November 1, 2018, to report certain information to the Senate Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee and the House Health and Government Operations Committee; etc.
Title
Procurement - Board of Public Works - Workforce Health Care Study
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-2) (Y: 134 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-2) |
2018-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {466083/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-02-15 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-01 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Forms
General Services, Department of
Health
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Penalties and Sentences
Prices
Procurement
Public Works, Board of
Records
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Procurement
Time
Work, Labor and Employment
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Forms
General Services, Department of
Health
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Penalties and Sentences
Prices
Procurement
Public Works, Board of
Records
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Procurement
Time
Work, Labor and Employment