MD HB774 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 320
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 320
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Including in the Nondepository Special Fund certain fees, assessments, or revenue received by the Commissioner of Financial Regulation associated with the Commissioner's authority to investigate complaints of violations by credit card processors; requiring the Commissioner to pay into the General Fund of the State certain fines and penalties collected by the Commissioner from credit card processors; altering the purpose of the Nondepository Special Fund; etc.
Title
Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Nondepository Special Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 320 |
2020-03-17 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-02-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2020-02-26 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-26 | House | Favorable with Amendments {443790/1 Adopted |
2020-02-25 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2020-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-31 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB409 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 321
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Financial Institutions | 11 | 610 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |