MD HB772 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 423
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 423
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the trustees or other officers in charge of a trust fund account or fund for self-insurance purposes of a political subdivision of the State or a unit of a political subdivision to make specified investments in a specified manner.
Title
Local Government Investments - Self-Insurance Funds and Trust Fund Accounts of Political Subdivisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 423 |
2014-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:45 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2014-03-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2014-03-04 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-04 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-03 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2014-02-18 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading Appropriations |