MD HB771 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 133
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Police Commissioner of Baltimore City to report annually specified information concerning the Baltimore Police Department to the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore and the members of the Baltimore City Delegation to the General Assembly; and requiring the report to be made available on the Department's Web site.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baltimore Police Department - Reporting on Community Policing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-1) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-12HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 133
2015-04-13HouseReturned Passed
2015-04-13SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2015-04-13SenateSecond Reading Passed
2015-04-13SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2015-04-13SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2015-04-02SenateHearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2015-03-23SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2015-03-20HouseThird Reading Passed (137-1)
2015-03-19HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2015-03-19HouseFavorable with Amendments {332110/1 Report Adopted
2015-03-19HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2015-03-12HouseHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2015-02-13HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0771?ys=2015rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/bills/hb/hb0771f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/bills/hb/hb0771t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/Chapters_noln/CH_133_hb0771t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2015RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0771_33211001.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/fnotes/bil_0001/hb0771.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/votes_comm/hb0771_jud.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/votes_comm/hb0771_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0771,h-0436&stab=02&ys=2015RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0771,s-1143&stab=02&ys=2015RS

Bill Comments 750

feedback