MD HB77 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying that regular interest may not be paid on member contributions of specified members of the Judges' Retirement System under specified circumstances; providing that an individual who was a member of the Judges' Retirement System on or before June 30, 2012, is separated from employment for more than 4 years, and returns to employment in a position that requires membership in the Judges' Retirement System is subject to specified requirements; etc.
Title
Judges' Retirement System - Membership, Benefits, and Reemployment
Sponsors
Del. Ben Barnes [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2015-04-10 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2015-04-10 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {259338/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 8:30 a.m. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2015-02-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2015-02-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-02-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {264567/1 Report Adopted |
2015-02-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2015-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-23 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Interest
Judges
Mandatory Retirement
Retirement Systems
State Pensions and Retirement
Work, Labor and Employment
Judges
Mandatory Retirement
Retirement Systems
State Pensions and Retirement
Work, Labor and Employment