MD HB768 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the State Highway Administration to issue a seasonal exceptional poultry hauling permit that authorizes specified axle configurations and specified increased weight limits while carrying live poultry from a farm to a processing facility from November 1 until April 30 annually in specified counties; requiring a combination of vehicles carrying live poultry with a trailer or semitrailer to submit to and pass a specified inspection twice yearly; requiring the operator of the specified vehicle to carry the inspection report; etc.
Title
Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Poultry Hauling Permit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {628672/1 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2017-04-05 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2017-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2017-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {430414/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-03-02 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Agriculture
Caroline County
Cecil County
Dorchester County
Eastern Shore
Farmland
Highway Administration, State
Highways
Kent County
Licenses
Meat, Poultry, Seafood
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Queen Anne's County
Reports
Somerset County
Sunset
Talbot County
Time
Trucks
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections
Weights and Measures
Wicomico County
Worcester County
Caroline County
Cecil County
Dorchester County
Eastern Shore
Farmland
Highway Administration, State
Highways
Kent County
Licenses
Meat, Poultry, Seafood
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Queen Anne's County
Reports
Somerset County
Sunset
Talbot County
Time
Trucks
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections
Weights and Measures
Wicomico County
Worcester County