MD HB766 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-8)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding eligibility for a certain credit authorized against the county or municipal corporation property tax to include certain members or retired members of the armed forces of the United States and certain surviving spouses; authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City or the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to provide, by law, for certain eligibility criteria; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2020; etc.
Title
Property Tax Credit - Disabled Military Personnel and Surviving Spouses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-31 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB700 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 642
Subjects
Armed Forces
Counties
Disabilities
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Spouses
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property
Veterans
Counties
Disabilities
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Spouses
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property
Veterans
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 9 | 258 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0766?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb0766f.pdf |