MD HB763 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB622
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 147
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 147
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the membership of the Correctional Officers' Retirement System to include certain individuals serving in certain positions in the Department of Juvenile Services; providing for the calculation of a certain benefit from the Correctional Officers' Retirement System for individuals serving in certain positions on or before June 30, 2022; requiring the State Retirement Agency, on or before January 1, 2023, to notify the individuals who are affected by the Act of their right to transfer certain service credit; etc.
Title
Correctional Officers’ Retirement System – Membership
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 123 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 123 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 147 |
2022-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment {253821/1 Withdrawn |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Motion Reconsider Favorable Report as Amended (Senator Guzzone) Adopted |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Guzzone) Adopted |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {253821/1 Adopted |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (123-16) |
2022-03-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {203922/1 Adopted |
2022-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2022-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m. |
2022-02-03 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB231 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-07 - Rereferred to Appropriations
SB622 (Carry Over) 2020-03-04 - Hearing 3/05 at 3:30 p.m.
SB622 (Carry Over) 2020-03-04 - Hearing 3/05 at 3:30 p.m.
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Correctional Officers
Disabilities
Juvenile Services, Department of
Notices
Retirement
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Government - Pensions and Retirement
Work, Labor, and Employment
Committees and Commissions
Correctional Officers
Disabilities
Juvenile Services, Department of
Notices
Retirement
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Government - Pensions and Retirement
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Personnel and Pensions | 25 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 25 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |