MD HB76 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 618
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 618
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a person who meets the threshold standing requirements under the federal Clean Water Act has an unconditional right and authority to intervene in a civil action that the State initiates in State court to require compliance with certain water pollution control measures; requiring a person exercising a certain right of intervention to intervene in accordance with the applicable practices, procedures, and laws of the State; etc.
Title
Water Pollution Control – Intervention in Civil Actions – Rights and Authority
Sponsors
Del. Sara Love [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 92 N: 40 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 92 N: 40 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 618 |
2021-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-3) |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (92-40) |
2021-02-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-02-16 | House | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Buckel) Adopted |
2021-02-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {400515/1 Adopted |
2021-02-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-12-22 | House | Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2020-10-28 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB334 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 619
Subjects
Appeals
Civil Actions
Courts
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Federal Government
Judicial Review
Rules and Regulations
Water Pollution
Civil Actions
Courts
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Federal Government
Judicial Review
Rules and Regulations
Water Pollution
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 9 | 344.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |