MD HB76 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 319
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 319
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners, by January 1, 2018, to develop and implement a scoring system for evaluating specified public school projects and, on or before January 1, 2020, to apply the scoring system to 75% of specified public school facilities, publish project scores on the Baltimore City Public School's Web site, and report project scores to the General Assembly; requiring the Board, by January 1, 2021, to apply the scoring system to the remaining 25% of public school facilities; etc.
Title
Baltimore City Public Schools - Capital Project Scoring System
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 319 |
2017-03-31 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2017-02-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-02-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {914860/1 Report Adopted |
2017-02-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2017-01-31 | House | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-12 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Electronic Government
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Information
Public Schools
Reports
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Electronic Government
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Information
Public Schools
Reports