MD HB76 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring specified accumulated contributions of nonvested former members to be transferred into a specified fund; clarifying that specified accumulated contributions shall be paid to specified former members under specified circumstances; requiring specified transferred accumulated contributions to be paid to specified nonvested former members from a specified fund under specified circumstances; and making conforming changes.
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Accumulated Contributions of Nonvested Former Members
Sponsors
Del. Ben Barnes [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2015-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 8:30 a.m. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2015-02-24 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2015-02-20 | House | Special Order until 2/24 (Delegate B. Barnes) Adopted |
2015-02-19 | House | Special Order until 2/20 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted |
2015-02-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-02-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {884561/1 Report Adopted |
2015-02-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2015-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-23 | House | First Reading Appropriations |