MD HB759 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 358
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 358
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a process for the formation of a specified holding company through the merger of a Maryland parent corporation with or into a specified wholly owned subsidiary of the Maryland parent corporation; providing that a vote of the stockholders of the parent corporation is not necessary to authorize the merger except under specified circumstances; requiring that the merger be approved by a majority of the entire board of directors of the parent corporation; etc.
Title
Corporations - Formation of a Holding Company by Merger
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 358 |
2017-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-13 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2017-03-08 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-08 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-07 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2017-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-02 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Charters
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Corporations
Corporations and Associations
Mergers and Acquisitions
Real Estate Investment Trusts
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Corporations
Corporations and Associations
Mergers and Acquisitions
Real Estate Investment Trusts