MD HB759 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-28 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-28 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to allow a person to hunt deer on a Sunday on private property in Calvert County from the first Sunday in October through the second Sunday in January of the following year, inclusive, subject to specified provisions of law.
Title
Calvert County - Deer Hunting - Sundays
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (120-15) (Y: 120 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (120-15) |
2014-03-17 | House | Special Order until after Third Reading calendar (Delegate Holmes) Adopted |
2014-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2014-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |