MD HB758 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 702
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 702
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering requirements for the storage and preservation of sexual assault evidence collection kits; requiring sexual assault evidence collection kits collected before January 1, 2000, to be retained and transferred in a certain manner; and requiring the Maryland Sexual Assault Evidence Kit Policy and Funding Committee, by December 1, 2023, to issue a report to the Governor and the General Assembly on certain recommendations, in consultation with the Consumer Protection Division of the Office of the Attorney General.
Title
Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kits - Preservation and Storage
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 702 |
2023-04-10 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2023-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2023-04-10 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {733826/1 Adopted |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 4/4 (Senator Smith) Adopted |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {733826/1 |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2023-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2023-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {403528/1 Adopted |
2023-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2023-02-09 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB789 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 703
Subjects
Attorney General
Chemical Tests
Circuit Courts
Court Orders
Criminal Law - Procedures
Health Occupations
Law Enforcement
Records
Sexual Offenses
Storage
Chemical Tests
Circuit Courts
Court Orders
Criminal Law - Procedures
Health Occupations
Law Enforcement
Records
Sexual Offenses
Storage
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Procedure | 11 | 926 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |