MD HB758 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Veto sustained (0-140)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Veto sustained (0-140)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the Public Local Laws of Garrett County to require the Board of County Commissioners of Garrett County to appropriate specified funds for the benefit of specified rescue squads; and authorizing the County Commissioners to pay the value of a specified appropriation to a rescue squad by in-kind payment of personnel, equipment, or services.
Title
Garrett County - Payment to Rescue Squads
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-10 | House | Veto sustained (0-140) |
2017-05-26 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2017-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2017-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {460713/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-02 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Counties - Local Laws
County Commissioners
Garrett County
Public Local Laws
Reports
Rescue Squads
Revenue and Taxes
County Commissioners
Garrett County
Public Local Laws
Reports
Rescue Squads
Revenue and Taxes