MD HB758 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the structure, membership, and duties of county oyster committees in the State; repealing specified selection processes and establishing an election process for county oyster committees; requiring the Department of Natural Resources to report to each county oyster committee on or before February 28 of each year, the total amounts of the oyster surcharge and the oyster taxes collected, and the statewide revenues used for activities undertaken to restore and manage the oyster population in the Chesapeake Bay; etc.
Title
Natural Resources - County Oyster Committees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-04 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-17 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2016-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {560014/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2016-02-24 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-08 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Aquaculture
Chesapeake Bay
Coastal Bays
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Dredging
Electronic Government
Equipment
Fees
Fish and Fishing
Hearings
Hunting and Fishing
Natural Resources
Natural Resources, Department of
Notices
Oysters
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Chesapeake Bay
Coastal Bays
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Dredging
Electronic Government
Equipment
Fees
Fish and Fishing
Hearings
Hunting and Fishing
Natural Resources
Natural Resources, Department of
Notices
Oysters
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations