MD HB758 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force on Funding a Green Technology, Life Science, and Health Information Technology Loan Assistance Repayment Program; providing for members of the Task Force, the staff, and the designation of a chair; requiring the Task Force to conduct a study and make recommendations on or before December 31, 2011, for a program that assists graduates who earned a degree in a field relating to green technology or specified related fields to repay a federal or State higher education loan; etc.
Title
Task Force on Funding a Green Technology, Life Science, and Health Information
Sponsors
Del. Tiffany Alston [D] | Del. Kumar Barve [D] | Del. Talmadge Branch [D] | Del. Luke Clippinger [D] |
Del. Bonnie Cullison [D] | Del. William Frick [D] | Del. Keith Haynes [D] | Del. Keiffer Mitchell [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 117 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 117 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-07 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-04-06 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-06 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-09 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-04-06 | Hearing 4/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-04-06 | Re-referred Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-03-30 | First Reading Senate Rules | |
2011-04-08 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-29 | Third Reading Passed (117-17) | |
2011-03-28 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-28 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-30 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | |
2011-03-08 | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-08 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-02-16 | Hearing 3/9 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-10 | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Appropriations
Committees and Commissions
Computers
Energy Matters
Environmental Matters
Health
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Loans
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment
Appropriations
Committees and Commissions
Computers
Energy Matters
Environmental Matters
Health
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Loans
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment