MD HB757 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Governor to appoint five members, instead of three, to the Board of License Commissioners for Anne Arundel County; requiring that members be appointed from each legislative district in Anne Arundel County; requiring certain members of the General Assembly jointly to select an individual to be recommended to the Governor for a certain appointment; limiting the number of terms that a member of the Board may serve to 4 consecutive terms; staggering the terms of members of the Board; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Board of License Commissioners Membership Revisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-15SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (131-0)
2020-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {213390/1 Adopted
2020-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2020-02-04HouseHearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-31HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Same As/Similar To

SB32 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-12 - Referred Economic Matters

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Alcoholic Beverages11101(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages11102(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages11201(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages11202(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages11203(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback