MD HB757 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-13 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-13 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $350,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Directors of the National Center on Institutions and Alternatives, Inc. for the acquisition, planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, capital equipping, and expansion of the National Center on Institutions and Alternatives, located in Baltimore County; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a requirement that the grantee provide and expend a matching fund; etc.
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - National Center on Institutions and Alternatives Expansion
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-13 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations |
2015-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/16 at 9:00 a.m. |
2015-03-06 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-14 | House | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Baltimore County
Developmental Disabilities
Ex-Offenders
Nonprofit Organizations
State Bonds
State Debt (Bond Bills)
Developmental Disabilities
Ex-Offenders
Nonprofit Organizations
State Bonds
State Debt (Bond Bills)