MD HB755 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-03 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-03 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that, unless good cause is shown, a petition for writ of error coram nobis may not be filed more than 3 years after the petitioner knew or should have known that the petitioner faces a significant collateral consequence from the conviction that is the basis for the petition.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Coram Nobis - Time for Filing
Sponsors
Del. David Moon [D] | Del. Joseph Vallario [D] | Del. Curtis Anderson [D] | Del. Elizabeth Proctor [D] |
Del. Carlos Sanchez [D] | Sen. Charles Sydnor [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (76-57) (Y: 76 N: 57 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-03 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (76-57) |
2017-02-28 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-02-28 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-27 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2017-02-14 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-02 | House | First Reading Judiciary |