MD HB753 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that a mortuary transport service be issued a permit by the Maryland State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors before removing or transporting human remains; establishing fees and requirements for obtaining a permit; requiring permit holders to use vehicles that have passed a specified inspection; requiring permit holders to employ only specified registered transporters; requiring that individuals employed by specified permit holders be registered with the Board before removing and transporting human remains; etc.
Title
Maryland State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Permits and
Sponsors
Del. Wade Kach [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-06 | Third Reading Passed (40-0) | |
2012-04-06 | Senate Recede | |
2012-04-06 | Committee Amendment 874830/1 Withdrawn | |
2012-04-06 | Motion Recede (Senator Conway) Adopted | |
2012-04-01 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) | |
2012-03-31 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-31 | Favorable with Amendments 874830/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-03-20 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-04-06 | Returned Passed | |
2012-04-03 | House Requests Senate Recede | |
2012-04-03 | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2012-03-19 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | |
2012-03-18 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-18 | Favorable with Amendments 846086/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-20 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2012-02-17 | Hearing 3/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-17 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-15 | Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-09 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Advertising
Bonds
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Death
Discipline
Discrimination
Fees
Fines
Fraud
Funerals
Hearings
Insurance
Interstate Affairs
Liability
Licenses
Morticians
Motor Vehicle Inspection
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Records
Registration
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Signs and Billboards
Substance Abuse
Transportation
Bonds
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Death
Discipline
Discrimination
Fees
Fines
Fraud
Funerals
Hearings
Insurance
Interstate Affairs
Liability
Licenses
Morticians
Motor Vehicle Inspection
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Records
Registration
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Signs and Billboards
Substance Abuse
Transportation