MD HB752 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 131
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 131
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing in Harford County the wine festival license that authorizes the display and sale of wine by the holder of a retail license, Class 3 winery license, or Class 4 limited winery license during the days and hours designated for the wine festival at a location that is not already licensed.
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wine Festival License - Repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (120-0) (Y: 121 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (120-0) (Y: 121 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 131 |
2018-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (120-0) |
2018-03-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-06 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2018-02-19 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-01 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Fairs
Harford County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Fairs
Harford County
License Commissioners, Boards of