MD HB751 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing, from two to one, the number of sets of fingerprints an applicant for licensure or registration by the State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners is required to submit to the Criminal Justice Information System Central Repository to obtain a criminal history records check; and requiring the Central Repository to provide to the Board a revised printed statement of the individual's criminal history record if criminal history record information is reported to the Central Repository after the initial criminal history records check.
Title
State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners - License and Registration - Criminal History Records Checks
Sponsors
Del. Susan Krebs [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2020-03-10 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-09 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-31 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Archives
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Disclosure
Fingerprinting
Health
Health Occupations
Licenses
Massage
Physical Therapists
Records
Registration
Reports
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Disclosure
Fingerprinting
Health
Health Occupations
Licenses
Massage
Physical Therapists
Records
Registration
Reports
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 6 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |