MD HB751 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 549
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 549
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain insurers, health service plans, and health maintenance organizations to allow a health care provider to indicate whether a prescription drug is to be used to treat a chronic condition; prohibiting an entity from requesting a reauthorization for a repeat prescription for 1 year or for the standard course of treatment for the chronic condition being treated, whichever is less; requiring a certain entity to maintain a certain database for prior authorizations that are filed electronically; etc.
Title
Health Insurance - Prior Authorization - Requirements
Sponsors
Del. Terri Hill [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 549 |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {296884/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-02-13 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Consumer Protection
Diseases
Drugs
Emergencies
Equipment
Health
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance
Insurance - Health
Medical Treatments
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Opioids
Patients
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Pharmacy Benefits Managers
Physicians
Records
Diseases
Drugs
Emergencies
Equipment
Health
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance
Insurance - Health
Medical Treatments
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Opioids
Patients
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Pharmacy Benefits Managers
Physicians
Records