MD HB751 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-17 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-17 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a restaurant, beginning March 1, 2016, to request that a customer inform the employee taking the customer's food order of any known food allergies before ordering; providing that the request may be included on a specified sign or a menu or menu board or made by the employee taking the customer's food order; requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to make available on its Web site a list of specified food allergen awareness training courses and tests and a list of specified resources; etc.
Title
Health - Food Allergy Awareness
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2015-03-13 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Disclosure
Diseases
Electronic Government
Examinations
Food
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Job Training
Notices
Public Health
Restaurants
Signs and Billboards
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Diseases
Electronic Government
Examinations
Food
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Job Training
Notices
Public Health
Restaurants
Signs and Billboards
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials