MD HB749 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-6)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a dental hygienist who complies with certain provisions of the Act to prescribe certain types of prescription or over-the-counter fluoride preparations, topical antimicrobial oral rinses, and up to a 600 mg dose of ibuprofen every 6 hours for 3 days; prohibiting a dental hygienist from prescribing certain drugs and from administering certain medications; authorizing a dental hygienist who complies with certain provisions of the Act to administer medication under a certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Occupations - Dental Hygienists - Authority to Prescribe and Administer Medication

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2020-03-18SenateMotion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
2020-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-15SenateHearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m.
2020-03-15SenateHearing canceled
2020-03-10SenateHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-09SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-06HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2020-03-04HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-04HouseFavorable with Amendments {946288/1 Adopted
2020-03-03HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2020-02-04HouseHearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-31HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health Occupations12101(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations12102(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations4205(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations4206.4(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback