MD HB747 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Adding certain agencies to the list of agencies that are designated as automatic voter registration agencies; defining an applicable transaction at certain automatic voter registration agencies during which an applicant must be registered to vote or have a voter registration record updated unless the applicant declines to register to vote or update a voter registration record or the applicant is determined not to be eligible to register to vote; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election Law – Links to Online Voter Registration

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2019-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {335364/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-02-12HouseHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback