MD HB746 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 806
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Attorney General to assign an assistant Attorney General to provide legal services to the Public School Labor Relations Board, the Higher Education Labor Relations Board, and the State Labor Relations Board; requiring the chair of the Public School Labor Relations Board to be a specified member of that Board; providing that, in connection with the Board's administration and enforcement of provisions of law, references to written communications include electronic communications; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public School Labor Relations Board - Administration and Enforcement - Revisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-27HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 806
2017-04-04HouseReturned Passed
2017-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2017-04-03SenateSecond Reading Passed
2017-04-03SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2017-04-03SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2017-03-30SenateHearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-03-16SenateFirst Reading Finance
2017-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2017-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed
2017-03-14HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2017-03-13HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2017-03-07HouseHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-02-02HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback