MD HB741 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removing the Deputy Director of the Maryland Environmental Service as a designated officer of the Service and instead authorizing the Board of Directors of the Service to appoint a Deputy Director to assist the Director in a certain manner; providing that the Deputy Director and certain officers of the Service serve at the pleasure of the Board; altering the size and membership of the Board; requiring Board members to file a certain financial statement; providing that the Director serves as a nonvoting member of the Board; etc.
Title
Maryland Environmental Service - Officers, Board of Directors, and Responsibilities - Alterations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-16 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations |
2021-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-26 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB575 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-27 - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Auditors and Audits
Budgets
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Demographics
Disclosure
Emergency Bills
Environment
Environmental Matters
Ethics
Evidence
Examinations
Governor
Health
internet
Open Government
Public Information
Public Officials
Publications
Reports
Safety
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Treasurers
Voting
Work, Labor, and Employment
Auditors and Audits
Budgets
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Demographics
Disclosure
Emergency Bills
Environment
Environmental Matters
Ethics
Evidence
Examinations
Governor
Health
internet
Open Government
Public Information
Public Officials
Publications
Reports
Safety
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Treasurers
Voting
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
General Provisions | 5 | 601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 3 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 3 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 3 | 103.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 3 | 103.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 3 | 126 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |