MD HB741 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 553
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 553
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting specified private career schools and specified for-profit institutions of higher education from enrolling a student in a program that is intended to lead to employment in a field that requires licensure in the State if successful completion of the educational course offerings will not meet the State educational requirements for licensure or certification, or the school is aware of any other factors that may lead to the ineligibility of the student to pursue or obtain licensure or certification in the State; etc.
Title
Higher Education - Institutions of Postsecondary Education - Consumer Protection Provisions
Sponsors
Del. Dana Stein [D] | Del. Anne Kaiser [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-2) (Y: 134 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-2) (Y: 134 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 553 |
2016-04-11 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-1) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-04-07 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2016-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-2) |
2016-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {484564/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2016-02-23 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Claims
Comptroller
Consumer Protection
Fees
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Job Training
Licenses
Penalties and Sentences
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Tuition
Work, Labor and Employment
Comptroller
Consumer Protection
Fees
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Job Training
Licenses
Penalties and Sentences
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Tuition
Work, Labor and Employment