MD HB741 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 533
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 533
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program; establishing a Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Fund and a Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Fund Authority in the Department of Business and Economic Development; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill specified appropriations to the Fund for specified fiscal years; providing for the membership and duties of the Authority; providing for the duties of the Department in connection with the Program; etc.
Title
Business and Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (103-31) (Y: 103 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (103-31) (Y: 103 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 533 |
2014-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2014-04-07 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2014-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (103-31) |
2014-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments {725362/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2014-03-05 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Appropriations
Biometrics
Business and Economic Development, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Corporations
Economic and Community Development
Electronic Government
Energy Matters
Environmental Matters
Equipment
Federal Government
Gifts
Higher Education
Income Tax
Industry and Technology
Insurance
Insurance Administration
Investments
Laboratories
Language
Liability
Medical Research
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Tax Credits
Taxes - Miscellaneous
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Transportation
Appropriations
Biometrics
Business and Economic Development, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Corporations
Economic and Community Development
Electronic Government
Energy Matters
Environmental Matters
Equipment
Federal Government
Gifts
Higher Education
Income Tax
Industry and Technology
Insurance
Insurance Administration
Investments
Laboratories
Language
Liability
Medical Research
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Tax Credits
Taxes - Miscellaneous
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Transportation