MD HB740 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 535
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 535
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Cybersecurity Investment Fund in the Maryland Technology Development Corporation as a special, nonlapsing fund; specifying the purpose of the Fund; requiring the Corporation to administer the Fund; requiring the State Treasurer to hold the Fund and the Comptroller to account for the Fund; specifying the contents of the Fund; specifying the purpose for which the Fund may be used; providing for the investment of money in and expenditures from the Fund; etc.
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Cybersecurity Investment Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (95-41) (Y: 95 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (95-41) (Y: 95 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 535 |
2014-04-01 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2014-03-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (95-41) |
2014-02-27 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-02-26 | House | Special Order until 2/27 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted |
2014-02-26 | House | Favorable with Amendments {803499/1 Report Adopted |
2014-02-25 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2014-02-19 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Economic and Community Development
Industry and Technology
Interest
Investments
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Industry and Technology
Interest
Investments
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Telecommunications and Information Technology